Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0826320

EP0826320 - Method for heat treatment of hair and device for using same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2004Revocation of patentpublished on 01.12.2004  [2004/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wella Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Allee 65
64274 Darmstadt / DE
[1998/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Fertig, Werner
Gärtnerweg 8
64625 Bensheim / DE
[1998/10]
Application number, filing date97114680.825.08.1997
[1998/10]
Priority number, dateDE199613521330.08.1996         Original published format: DE 19635213
[1998/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0826320
Date:04.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0826320
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0826320
Date:23.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A45D7/06, A45D20/30, A45D19/00
[2000/03]
Former International [1998/10]A45D7/06
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL [2000/39]
Former [1998/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Wärmebehandlung von Kopfhaar sowie eine Vorrichtung zur Verwendung des Verfahrens[1998/10]
English:Method for heat treatment of hair and device for using same[1998/10]
French:Procédé de traitement thermique des cheveux et dispositif d'utilisation du procédé[1998/10]
Examination procedure25.08.1997Examination requested  [1998/10]
11.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2001Fee for grant paid
26.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.10.2002   
OLYMP Karl Herzog GmbH & Co. KG
Hohenheimer Strasse 91-97
70184 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmitt, Martin
Kohler Schmid + Partner
Patentanwälte
Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/51]
Opponent(s)01  22.10.2002   
OLYMP Karl Herzog GmbH & Co. KG
Hohenheimer Strasse 91-97
70184 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmitt, Martin, Dipl.-Ing.
Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
29.11.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.06.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.05.2004Date of oral proceedings
11.05.2004Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/49]
28.06.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.06.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL23.01.2002
ES30.07.2002
LU25.08.2002
BE31.08.2002
[2004/39]
Former [2004/04]NL23.01.2002
ES30.07.2002
BE31.08.2002
Former [2003/51]NL23.01.2002
BE31.08.2002
Former [2003/09]NL23.01.2002
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4766913  (KLEIN GUSTAVE J) [X] 1-3,7 * column 6, paragraph 5 - column 7, paragraph 1; claim 1 * [Y] 5;
 [YA]FR1533369  (SOCIETE DE VENTILATION ET D'ELECTRICITE APPLIQUEES) [Y] 5 * column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 1 * [A] 6;
 [X]US4131121  (ARAKI MASAKATSU ET AL) [X] 1-3 * column 4, paragraph 1 * * column 10, line 1 - line 25 *;
 [A]FR2707851  (SEB SA) [A] 1-3 * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 24 *;
 [A]GB1213884  (CALOR APPAREILS DOMESTIQUES) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 49; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3112384  (MUEHOLOS WERK ALFRED MUELLER) [A] * the whole document *