Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0838856

EP0838856 - Integrated protection device against overloading [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2007
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.10.2007  [2007/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1998/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Schirmer, Guenter
Verdistrasse 25
72768 Reutlingen / DE
02 / Werner, Frank
Griesssteinstrasse 28
72805 Lichtenstein / DE
03 / Raub, Hans
Burkhardt + Weber-Strasse 35
72760 Reutlingen / DE
[1998/18]
Application number, filing date97114966.129.08.1997
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateDE199614419324.10.1996         Original published format: DE 19644193
[1998/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0838856
Date:29.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0838856
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/02
[1998/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   SE [2001/12]
Former [1998/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Integrierte Überlastschutzeinrichtung[1998/18]
English:Integrated protection device against overloading[1998/18]
French:Dispositif intégré de protection contre des surcharges[1998/18]
Examination procedure12.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/11]
01.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/43]
21.05.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0704889  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,13,14 * page -; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0561461  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,6,7,12,13 * abstract *;
 [A]US5519341  (CORSI MARCO [US], et al) [A] 1,6,8-10,14 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - line 33 *;
 [A]JPH0819164  ;
 [A]EP0704902  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,8 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4015625  (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 1,6,8 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9612347  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,6,7,12,13
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, [A] 1,6,8,11 * abstract *