Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0832836

EP0832836 - Pocket with adjustable height for a sheet conveying device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2002
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Former [1998/14]For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
D-69115 Heidelberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klopfenstein, Andrew L.
175 S. Tippecanoe Drive
Tipp City, Ohio 45371 / US
[1998/14]
Representative(s)Duschl, Edgar Johannes , et al
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]Duschl, Edgar Johannes , et al
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Former [1998/14]Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Patentabteilung, Kurfürstenanlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Application number, filing date97115082.601.09.1997
[1998/14]
Priority number, dateUS1996071986325.09.1996         Original published format: US 719863
[1998/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0832836
Date:01.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0832836
Date:11.11.1998
[1998/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0832836
Date:02.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65H39/02
[1998/14]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1999/29]
Former [1998/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Höhenverstellbare Tasche für eine Bogenmaterial-Fördervorrichtung[1998/14]
English:Pocket with adjustable height for a sheet conveying device[1998/14]
French:Poche à hauteur réglable pour un dispositif de transport de feuilles[1998/14]
Examination procedure01.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/14]
16.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2000Fee for grant paid
22.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR02.05.2001
[2006/14]
Former [2002/18]FR21.12.2001
Documents cited:Search[XDA]US5527025  (SCHLOUGH JAMES R [US]) [XD] 1 * the whole document * [A] 8