Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0826897

EP0826897 - Brake pad for a disc brake [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.12.2002  [2002/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TMD Friction GmbH
Schlebuscher Strasse 99
51381 Leverkusen / DE
[2001/06]
Former [1998/10]For all designated states
TEXTAR GmbH
Jägerstrasse 1-25
51375 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Röhling, Willmut
Am Lindenstock 1a
53809 Ruppichteroth / DE
02 / Helten, Herbert
Fuchsweg 37
51766 Engelskirchen / DE
03 / Herrmann, Helmut
Hitdorfer Strasse 217
51371 Leverkusen / DE
[1998/10]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem.
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date97115177.402.09.1997
[1998/10]
Priority number, dateDE1996215283U03.09.1996         Original published format: DE 29615283 U
[1998/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0826897
Date:04.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0826897
Date:01.04.1998
[1998/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0826897
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:F16D69/04
[1998/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1998/51]
Former [1998/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bremsbacke für Scheibenbremsen[1998/10]
English:Brake pad for a disc brake[1998/10]
French:Plaquette de frein à disque[1998/10]
Examination procedure01.10.1998Examination requested  [1998/51]
24.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2001Fee for grant paid
10.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1952317U  (TEVES KG ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 32; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JPH04282035  ;
 [A]JPS56150632
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930218), vol. 017, no. 083, Database accession no. (M - 1369), [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820305), vol. 006, no. 036, Database accession no. (M - 115), [A] * abstract *
by applicantDE1952317