Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0834852

EP0834852 - Teaching aid for teaching motor vehicle driving on a simulator, method of making this aid and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OERLIKON CONTRAVES AG
Birchstrasse 155
8050 Zürich / CH
[2000/14]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Oerlikon Contraves AG
Birchstrasse 155
8050 Zürich / CH
Former [1998/15]For all designated states
Oerlikon-Contraves AG
Birchstrasse 155
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Dueringer, Heinrich
Katzenbachweg 1
8052 Zürich / CH
02 / Thoeni, Urban, Dr.
Wingertstrasse 14d
8308 Illnau / CH
[1998/15]
Representative(s)Heusch, Christian , et al
OK pat AG
Industriestrasse 47
6300 Zug / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/26]Heusch, Christian , et al
c/o OK pat AG, Chamerstrasse 50
6300 Zug / CH
Former [2000/14]Hotz, Klaus, Dipl.-El.-Ing./ETH
c/o OK pat AG, Patente Marken Lizenzen, Hinterbergstrasse 36, Postfach 5254
6330 Cham / CH
Former [1998/15]Hotz, Klaus, Dipl.-El.-Ing./ETH Patentanwalt
c/o OK pat AG Hinterbergstrasse 36 Postfach 5254
6330 Cham / CH
Application number, filing date97115245.903.09.1997
[1998/15]
Priority number, dateCH1996000226416.09.1996         Original published format: CH 226496
[1998/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0834852
Date:08.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0834852
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.1998
ClassificationInternational:G09B19/16, G09B9/05
[1998/15]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1998/52]
Former [1998/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lehrmittel zum Erlernen des Führens eines Motorfahrzeuges in einer Simultationsanlage, Verfahren zur Herstellung des Lehrmittels und Verwendung des Lehrmittels[1998/15]
English:Teaching aid for teaching motor vehicle driving on a simulator, method of making this aid and its use[1998/15]
French:Moyen didactique pour l'apprentissage de la conduite d'un véhicule sur simulateur, méthode de réalisation de ce moyen et son utilisation[1998/15]
Examination procedure02.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/36]
13.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.1999Fee for grant paid
30.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.10.2000  20.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
THALES
173, boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Lucas, Laurent Jacques
Marks & Clerk France
Conseils en Propriété Industrielle
Immeuble Visium
22, Avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2008/33]
Opponent(s)01  11.10.2000  20.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
THALES
173, boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Lucas, Laurent Jacques
Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
Former [2001/51]
Opponent(s)01  11.10.2000  20.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
THALES
173, boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Lucas, Laurent Jacques
Thales Intellectual Property, 13, avenue du Président Salvador Allende
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
Former [2001/32]
Opponent(s)01  11.10.2000  20.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
THOMSON-CSF
173, boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Montelmacher, Pascal
THALES Intellectual Property, 13 Avenue du Président Salvador Allende
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
Former [2000/49]
Opponent(s)01  11.10.2000  20.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
THOMSON-CSF
173, boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Chaverneff, Vladimir
Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende
94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR
21.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.11.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.07.2001Date of oral proceedings
13.08.2001Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.08.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.11.2004Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/01]
17.11.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.10.2001Appeal received No.  T1169/01
17.12.2001Statement of grounds filed
05.11.2004Result of appeal procedure: REVOCATION OF PATENT AT PROPRIETOR'S REQUEST
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[DX]NL9100838  (NEDERLANDSE ORG TOEGEPAST) [DX] 1,2,10 * page 1, line 27 - page 11, line 2; claims 1-6,8-16 *;
 [X]WO9419785  (SSES AB ;ERIKSSON IDA (SE)) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 2; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9419784  (ATARI GAMES CORP) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5311422  (LOFTIN R BOWEN ET AL) [A] 1,3,5,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9416423  (ROADS CORP ;HULL MICHAEL ALAN (AU)) [A] 1,5,7,12 * page 3, line 13 - page 8, line 21; figures 1-8; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9419783  (MAGIC EDGE INC) [A] 1 * page 3, line 13 - page 17, line 23; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0483991  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2260304  (DORNIER LUFTFAHRT) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0391546  (DORON PRECISION SYST) [A] 1,5,12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - "DRIVING SIMULATION AT FORD", AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING, (19940901), vol. 102, no. 9, pages 37 - 40, XP000469064 [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - VAN WOLFFELAAR P C ET AL, A NEW DRIVING SIMULATOR INCLUDING AN INTERACTIVE INTELLIGENT TRAFFIC ENVIRONMENT, OLAUSSEN L;HELLI E, PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICLE NAVIGATION AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CONFERENCE, OSLO, SEPT. 2 - 4, 1992, NR. CONF. 3, PAGE(S) 499 - 506, (19920902), XP000365995 [A] 1,5,6 * the whole document *