Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0834852 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0834852



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1840
15.06.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
17.11.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 6
29.10.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.10.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.10.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.10.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.10.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.10.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.2004 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
20.10.2004 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 3
20.10.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
15.10.2004 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
15.10.2004 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 4
15.10.2004 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 7
15.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
14.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
22.09.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.09.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.09.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.09.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.08.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.08.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.08.2004 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.08.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 7
05.02.2004 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
02.01.2004 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
02.01.2004 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
14.05.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
03.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.04.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
25.04.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
27.12.2001 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.12.2001 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
20.12.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
17.12.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 25
06.11.2001 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
05.11.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
05.11.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
05.11.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.11.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
25.10.2001 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
15.10.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 9
15.10.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
12.10.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
23.08.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.08.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.08.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.08.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.08.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 9
13.08.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
13.08.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
13.08.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
13.08.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
13.08.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 16
13.08.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
13.08.2001 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
13.08.2001 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
13.08.2001 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.08.2001 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.07.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
01.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
27.06.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
27.06.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
27.06.2001 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.06.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.06.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.06.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.06.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.06.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.06.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.06.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.06.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.06.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.06.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.06.2001 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 110
15.06.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.06.2001 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 18
13.06.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.06.2001 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.06.2001 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.06.2001 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.06.2001 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.06.2001 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.06.2001 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 19
11.06.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
15.05.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
16.02.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.02.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.02.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.02.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.02.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.02.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.02.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
07.02.2001 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
07.02.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
07.02.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
25.01.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.11.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.11.2000 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 14
28.11.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.11.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.11.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.10.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 184
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 17
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 15
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 35
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 29
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 26
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 29
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 15
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 118
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 22
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 74
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 11
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 36
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 58
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 120
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 28
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 22
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 11
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 20
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.10.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 34
11.10.2000 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 62
11.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
11.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 61
11.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
21.02.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
05.02.2000 General authorisation Search / examination 3
05.02.2000 Request for assignment Search / examination 3
02.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
30.07.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.07.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.07.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.06.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
25.06.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
23.06.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.06.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
17.06.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
28.05.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
17.05.1999 Description Search / examination 6
17.05.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.05.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
27.04.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.04.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
12.04.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
12.04.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
11.03.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.01.1999 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
10.12.1998 Claims Search / examination 4
10.12.1998 Claims Search / examination 4
10.12.1998 Description Search / examination 16
10.12.1998 Description Search / examination 16
10.12.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.12.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 23
13.11.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.01.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.01.1998 European search report Search / examination 3
13.09.1997 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.09.1997 Priority document Search / examination 28
03.09.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.09.1997 Claims Search / examination 4
03.09.1997 Description Search / examination 15
03.09.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.09.1997 Drawings Search / examination 8
03.09.1997 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
03.09.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6