Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0826359

EP0826359 - Adhesive as a coupling agent between elastic and rigid materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VOCO GmbH
Anton-Flettner-Strasse 1-3
27472 Cuxhaven / DE
[1998/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Harenbrock, Michael Dr.
Segelcke Strasse 52
27472 Cuxhaven / DE
02 / Plaumann, Manfred Thomas
Rugenbargsweg 23
27476 Cuxhaven / DE
[1998/10]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [1998/10]Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons
Neuer Wall 41
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date97115268.103.09.1997
[1998/10]
Priority number, dateDE199613569603.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19635696
DE199711234125.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712341
[1998/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0826359
Date:04.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0826359
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0826359
Date:01.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K6/083, A61K6/09, C09J133/00, C09J175/04
[1998/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/52]
Former [1998/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Adhäsiv als Haftvermittler zwischen elastischen und starren Materialien[1998/10]
English:Adhesive as a coupling agent between elastic and rigid materials[1998/10]
French:Adhésif comme agent de couplage entre des matériaux élastiques et rigides[1998/10]
Examination procedure15.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
20.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IE, LU, MC
27.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2005Fee for grant paid
21.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06]
Request for further processing for:20.04.2004Request for further processing filed
20.04.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.05.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
13.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI01.03.2006
IT01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
GR02.06.2006
ES12.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
AT03.09.2006
BE30.09.2006
[2008/21]
Former [2008/07]FI01.03.2006
IT01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
ES12.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
AT03.09.2006
BE30.09.2006
Former [2007/31]FI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
ES12.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
BE30.09.2006
Former [2007/17]FI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
ES12.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2006/45]FI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
SE01.06.2006
Former [2006/36]FI01.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP0632060  (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [XD] 1-5,7,9-11,15,16 * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 7 * * page 21, line 8 - page 22, line 2 * * examples 15,46; claim -; table - *;
 [A]JPH0468007  ;
 [AD]DE4414837  (KETTENBACH FABRIK CHEM ERZEUGN [DE])
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 15, Database accession no. 1992-121117, XP002131222 & JPH0468007 A 19920303 (FUJI SYSTEMS KK) [A] * abstract *