Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0829857

EP0829857 - Focus error detection system for an optical head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.09.2000
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.10.2000 [2000/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamanaka, Yutaka
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1998/12]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]Betten & Resch
Reichenbachstrasse 19
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date97115455.405.09.1997
[1998/12]
Priority number, dateJP1996023695006.09.1996         Original published format: JP 23695096
[1998/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0829857
Date:18.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0829857
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/09, G11B7/135, G11B7/13
[1998/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [2000/38]
Former [1998/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fokusfehlerermittlungssystem für einen optischen Kopf[1998/12]
English:Focus error detection system for an optical head[1998/12]
French:Système de détection d'erreur de focalisation pour une tête optique[1998/12]
Examination procedure06.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
31.08.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0501570  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8 * column 6, line 30 - column 8, line 37; figures 9,10 *;
 [X]US4712205  (SMID ALBERT [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9 * figure W *;
 [X]US5243585  (HOSHINO ISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,9 * column 16, line 12 - column 19, line 35; figures 17,20,21 *;
 [A]EP0452793  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 3,4 * page 6 - page 8; figure 11 *;
 [PXY]WO9723871  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1,2,5-8 * the whole document * [PY] 3,4;
 [Y]US4724533  (OHARA SHUNJI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,4 * the whole document *