Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0845927

EP0845927 - Circuit for operating low pressure discharge lamps with a low voltage source [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.11.2003  [2003/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Former [1998/23]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hirschmann, Walter
Fauststrasse 70
81827 München / DE
[1998/23]
Application number, filing date97115534.608.09.1997
[1998/23]
Priority number, dateDE199614917027.11.1996         Original published format: DE 19649170
[1998/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0845927
Date:03.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0845927
Date:30.06.1999
[1999/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0845927
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:H05B41/292, H02M3/338
[2002/48]
Former International [1999/26]H05B41/29, H02M3/338
Former International [1998/23]H05B41/29
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/10]
Former [1998/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schaltungsanordnung zum Betrieb einer Niederdruckentladungslampe an einer Niedervolt-Spannungsquelle[1998/23]
English:Circuit for operating low pressure discharge lamps with a low voltage source[1998/23]
French:Circuit pour alimenter une lampe à décharge basse pression par une source à basse tension[1998/23]
Examination procedure20.07.1999Examination requested  [1999/37]
25.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2002Fee for grant paid
19.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
16.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US4973885  (KERWIN RICHARD G [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 21; figures 1,2 *;
 [AD]EP0655880  (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [AD] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [A]US5237243  (CHUNG YEONG-CHOON [KR]);
 [A]US4071807  (ICHINOSE YOSHINOBU);
 [A]US3869640  (KOLOMYJEC TARAS AVENIR)