Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0828012

EP0828012 - Method for vaporizing liquid feed and vaporizer therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/11]For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Suzuki, Hidenao
1-4-28 Watauchi
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Horie, Kuniaki
Sanpia Odakyusakuragaoka 404, 1-15-2 Daikan
Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Nakada, Tsutomu
150-4-3-207 Hitorisawa, Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
04 / Murakami, Takeshi
3-9-8-302 Nakamagome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1998/11]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [1998/11]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97115559.308.09.1997
[1998/11]
Priority number, dateJP1996026026209.09.1996         Original published format: JP 26026296
[1998/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0828012
Date:11.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828012
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/00, B01D1/00
[1998/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/48]
Former [1998/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verdampfung flüssiger Beschickungen und Verdampfer dafür[1998/11]
English:Method for vaporizing liquid feed and vaporizer therefor[1998/11]
French:Procédé de vaporisation de liquides fournis à un vaporisateur et le vaporisateur correspondant[2000/46]
Former [1998/11]Procédé de vaporisation d'aliments liquides et vaporisateur pour cela
Examination procedure07.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/45]
07.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2001Fee for grant paid
22.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AP]WO9731391  (EBARA CORP [JP], et al) [AP] 1-9
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index [A] 1-9