EP0829465 - Process for the preparation of substituted indanones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horn, Hans Christoph, Dr. Römerstrasse 22 67245 Lambsheim / DE | 02 /
Spahl, Roland, Dr. Am Schanzenbuckel 19 64653 Lorsch / DE | 03 /
Müller, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Pfortmüllerstrasse 52 67269 Grünstadt / DE | 04 /
Trübenbach, Peter, Dr. Lindenstrasse 18 67065 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
Rieger, Bernhard, Prof. Dr. Johann-Stockar-Weg 50 89075 Ulm / DE | 06 /
Wagner, Jürgen Matthäus Lilienweg 11 89160 Dornstadt / DE | 07 /
Dietrich, Ulf F.-Sauerbruch-Weg 1/G 015 89079 Ulm / DE | [1998/12] | Application number, filing date | 97115613.8 | 09.09.1997 | [1998/12] | Priority number, date | DE1996137128 | 12.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19637128 | [1998/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0829465 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0829465 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C49/675, C07C45/46 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
C07C49/675 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/49] |
Former [1998/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung substituierter Indanone | [1998/12] | English: | Process for the preparation of substituted indanones | [1998/12] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'indanones substituées | [1998/12] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 19.09.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.10.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0812615 ; | [A]FR631003 (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0089302 (ROBERTET & CIE P [FR]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [DA]EP0587107 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DA] 1* claim - *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 096, no. 005, & JP08012615 A 19960116 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - R.T. HART ET AL., "Acylation-Alkylation Studies", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., DC US, (1950), vol. 72, pages 3286 - 3287, XP002049168 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01163a513 |