blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0843150

EP0843150 - Bullet catcher. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  10.12.2010
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2010Revocation of patentpublished on 12.01.2011  [2011/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Capito & Assenmacher GmbH & Co. KG
Frische Luft 151
44319 Dortmund / DE
[1999/51]
Former [1998/21]For all designated states
Capito & Assenmacher GmbH
Frische Luft 151
44319 Dortmund / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Arndt, Manfred
Lange Wand 17
59425 Unna / DE
[1998/21]
Representative(s)Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR
Postfach 10 46 45
44046 Dortmund / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/21]Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner
Westenhellweg 67
44137 Dortmund / DE
Application number, filing date97115665.810.09.1997
[1998/21]
Priority number, dateDE1996219982U16.11.1996         Original published format: DE 29619982 U
[1998/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0843150
Date:20.05.1998
Language:DE
[1998/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0843150
Date:02.12.1998
[1998/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0843150
Date:30.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:F41J1/14, F41J7/00
[1998/21]
CPC:
F41J13/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/32]
Former [1998/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Auffangen von Geschossen[1998/21]
English:Bullet catcher.[1998/21]
French:Collecteur de balles.[1998/21]
Examination procedure21.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/29]
03.06.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.09.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT
13.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2002Fee for grant paid
02.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.07.2003  02.09.2003  ADMISSIBLE
BRD vertreten durch das BMVg vertreten durch die OFD Nürnberg/OFD Münster vertreten durch den OFPr Dr. Horst Seelig
Krelingstrasse 50
90408 Nürnberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Blaumeier, Jörg
Lindner Blaumeier
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
 02  26.07.2003  02.09.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Dipl-Ing. Claus-Hermann Philipps
Untere Welle 2
31167 Bockenem / DE
Opponent's representative
Thömen, Uwe, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner
Zeppelinstrasse 5
30175 Hannover / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/01]
Opponent(s)01  16.07.2003  02.09.2003  ADMISSIBLE
BRD vertreten durch das BMVg vertreten durch die OFD Nürnberg/OFD Münster vertreten durch den OFPr Dr. Horst Seelig
Krelingstrasse 50
90408 Nürnberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Blaumeier, Jörg
LINDNER BLAUMEIER & KOLLEGEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 119109
90101 Nürnberg / DE
 02  26.07.2003  02.09.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Dipl-Ing. Claus-Hermann Philipps
Untere Welle 2
31167 Bockenem / DE
Opponent's representative
Thömen, Uwe, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5
30175 Hannover / DE
Former [2005/44]
Opponent(s)01  16.07.2003  02.09.2003  ADMISSIBLE
BRD vertreten durch das BMVg vertreten durch die OFD Nürnberg/OFD Münster vertreten durch den OFPr Dr. Horst Seelig
Krelingstrasse 50
90408 Nürnberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Matschkur, Peter
Matschkur - Lindner - Blaumeier, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Dr. Kurt-Schumacherstrasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
 02  26.07.2003  02.09.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Dipl-Ing. Claus-Hermann Philipps
Untere Welle 2
31167 Bockenem / DE
Opponent's representative
Thömen, Uwe, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5
30175 Hannover / DE
Former [2003/38]
Opponent(s)01  16.07.2003   
BRD vertreten durch das BMVg vertreten durch die OFD Nürnberg/OFD Münster vertreten durch den OFPr Dr. Horst Seelig
Krelingstrasse 50
90408 Nürnberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Matschkur, Peter
Matschkur - Lindner - Blaumeier, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Dr. Kurt-Schumacherstrasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
 02  26.07.2003   
Dipl-Ing. Claus-Hermann Philipps
Untere Welle 2
31167 Bockenem / DE
Opponent's representative
Körner, Peter
Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5
30175 Hannover / DE
Former [2003/37]
Opponent(s)01  16.07.2003   
BRD vertreten durch das BMVg vertreten durch die OFD Nürnberg/OFD Münster vertreten durch den OFPr Dr. Horst Seelig
Krelingstrasse 50
90408 Nürnberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Matschkur, Peter
Matschkur - Lindner - Blaumeier, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Dr. Kurt-Schumacherstrasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
05.09.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.03.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2006Reply to a communication from the opposition division
26.02.2008Date of oral proceedings
01.07.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.07.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.10.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/02]
02.11.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition05.09.2008Appeal received No.  T1782/08
10.11.2008Statement of grounds filed
05.10.2010Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
05.10.2010Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.07.1999BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999IT   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR30.10.2002
GB30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
DK30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
AT10.09.2003
CH30.09.2003
LI30.09.2003
[2007/17]
Former [2006/14]FR30.10.2002
GB30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
SE30.01.2003
AT10.09.2003
CH30.09.2003
LI30.09.2003
Former [2005/11]GB30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
SE30.01.2003
FR22.08.2003
AT10.09.2003
CH30.09.2003
LI30.09.2003
Former [2004/44]GB30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
SE30.01.2003
FR22.08.2003
CH30.09.2003
LI30.09.2003
Former [2004/22]GB30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
SE30.01.2003
FR22.08.2003
Former [2004/10]NL30.10.2002
SE30.01.2003
FR22.08.2003
Former [2003/30]NL30.10.2002
SE30.01.2003
Former [2003/27]SE30.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH08200997  ;
 [A]DE267621  (METALLWAREN- UND MASCHINENFABRIK S.KIEFER IN WORMS) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2427901  (CLARK EDGAR H) [Y] 1-3,9 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 38; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2035523  (APPLIED INTERIOR DESIGN LTD);
 [A]DE3721087  (THEISSEN FASSADEN UND MASCHINE [DE]) [A] 7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9415166  (MEY KLAUS PETER [DE]);
 [A]WO9427111  (SCOVATI ITALIA SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1,3 * page 16, line 19 - page 20, line 10; figure 14 *;
 [A]DE29604383U  (SPIETH ERNST K GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [YD]DE4441559  (PHILIPPS CLAUS HERMANN DIPL IN [DE]) [YD] 1-3,9 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE19503584  (BKE BILDTECHNIK INH ERNST STEC [DE]) [AD] 1,3 * abstract *;
 [XP]US5607163  (NESLER LESLIE F [US]) [XP] 1-3 * column 11, line 29 - column 12, line 64; figures 20-23 *;
 [AP]DE19601617  (BKE BILDTECHNIK ERNST [DE]) [AP] 1-9 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 96, no. 12, & JP08200997 A 19960809 (KYOSAN ELECTRIC MFG CO) [A] 1-3,5 * abstract *
by applicantDE3505823
 DE8621651U
 DE9217586U
 DE4441559
 DE19503584
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.