Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0829656

EP0829656 - Brake shoe assembly and method of forming [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.02.2004  [2004/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DANA CORPORATION
4500 Dorr Street
Toledo, OH 43615-4033 / US
[1998/32]
Former [1998/12]For all designated states
EATON CORPORATION
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Renaud, Steven Thomas
417 Elmstead Road - RR No. 1
Tecumseh Oichigan N8N 2LN / CA
02 / Koscielski, Larry Frank
1 Oakland Crescent
LaSalle, Ontario N9J 2J1 / CA
03 / Redgrave, Christopher Andrew
5881 Grand Traverse
Portage, Michigan 49002 / US
04 / Silvasi, Michael Louis
5790 Sandy Cove Drive
Kalamazoo, Michigan 49004 / US
05 / Larson, Ralph W.
9350 Pineview Drive
Olivet, Michigan 49076-9735 / US
[1998/12]
Representative(s)Rüger Abel
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 04 61
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Postfach 10 04 61
73704 Esslingen a. N. / DE
Application number, filing date97115893.612.09.1997
[1998/12]
Priority number, dateUS1996071422116.09.1996         Original published format: US 714221
[1998/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0829656
Date:18.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0829656
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0829656
Date:26.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16D65/08
[1998/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/15]
Former [2000/51]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  SE 
Former [1998/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bremsschuh und Methode zu dessen Herstellung[1998/12]
English:Brake shoe assembly and method of forming[1998/12]
French:Patin de frein et son procédé de fabrication[1998/12]
Examination procedure05.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
22.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2002Fee for grant paid
08.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08]
Request for further processing for:09.11.2001Request for further processing filed
09.11.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.11.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US5503256  (REDGRAVE CHRISOPHER A [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0349497  (BORA S R L E [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *