blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0829402

EP0829402 - Modular locomotive brake control unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
New York Air Brake Corporation
748 Starbuck Avenue Watertown
New York 13601 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]For all designated states
New York Air Brake Corporation
748 Starbuck Avenue
Watertown, New York 13601 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Pettit, D. Mark
20300 Country Rt. 3
LaFargeville, New York 13656 / US
02 / Allen, John J.
25750 NYS Rt. 12
Watertown, New York 13601 / US
03 / Newton, Ronald O.
10590 Wright St. Rd.
Adams, New York 13605 / US
04 / Pierce, Brett A.
112 Wendel Lane
Black River, New York 13612 / US
05 / Root, Kevin B.
RD No. 1 - Box 136
Black River, New York 13612 / US
06 / Sinn, Richard E.
10 Deer Run
Watertown, New York 13601 / US
07 / Wright, Eric C.
26156 Country Rt. 16
Evans Mills, New York 13637 / US
[1998/12]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter, et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Specht, Peter, et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Former [1998/19]Specht, Peter, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Loesenbeck, Stracke, Loesenbeck, Patentanwälte, Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
33613 Bielefeld / DE
Former [1998/12]Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Application number, filing date97115896.912.09.1997
[1998/12]
Priority number, dateUS19960026039P13.09.1996         Original published format: US 26039 P
[1998/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0829402
Date:18.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0829402
Date:26.07.2000
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0829402
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:B60T13/66, B60T17/22
[1998/12]
CPC:
B60T17/043 (EP,US); B60T13/665 (EP,US); B60T15/14 (EP,US);
B60T17/228 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/14]
Former [1998/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Modulare Bremssteuervorrichtung für eine Lokomotive[1998/12]
English:Modular locomotive brake control unit[1998/12]
French:Ensemble modulaire de commande de freinage d'une locomotive[1998/12]
Examination procedure18.12.1997Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
16.01.1998Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
26.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
23.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2003Fee for grant paid
05.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR14.05.2003
IT14.05.2003
SE14.08.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2006/32]FR14.05.2003
SE14.08.2003
Former [2003/50]SE14.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US4041470  (SLANE FRANCIS L, et al) [A] 1,30,45,49,51,55,57 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 9 *;
 [A]US4660895  (CHLUMECKY WAYNE E [US], et al) [A] 1,30,45,49,51,55,57* abstract *;
 [DA]US5172316  (ROOT KEVIN B [US], et al) [DA] 1,30,45,49,51,55,57 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - column 5, line 5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.