Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0818724

EP0818724 - Security system for electronic printing systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 020 Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/03]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square - 020
Rochester New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rourke, John L.
94 Waterford Way
Fairport, N.Y. 14450 / US
02 / Wing, Peter D.
94 Hefner Drive
Webster, N.Y. 14580 / US
03 / Ratcliffe, Jack F., II
19 Sunset Boulevard
Pittsford, N.Y. 14534 / US
04 / Valliere, Paul J.
15 Grimsby Gate
Fairport, N.Y. 14450 / US
[1998/03]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/03]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97116029.628.08.1991
[1998/03]
Priority number, dateUS1990059133028.09.1990         Original published format: US 591330
[1998/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0818724
Date:14.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0818724
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[1998/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/03]
TitleGerman:Sicherheitssystem für elektronische Drucksysteme[1998/03]
English:Security system for electronic printing systems[1998/03]
French:Système de sécurité pour systèmes d'impression électroniques[1998/03]
Examination procedure15.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/03]
18.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2000Fee for grant paid
13.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP91114459.0  / EP0477570
Opposition(s)27.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
15.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
15.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
15.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0366425  (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3 * figures 2,3 * * column 6, line 34 - line 49 * * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 6 *
 [Y]  BISHOP M, "COLLABORATION USING ROLES", SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE, (19900501), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 485 - 497, XP000137873 [Y] 1-3 * page 487, line 38 - page 488, line 1 * * page 488, line 20 - line 33 * * page 490, line 32 - page 493, line 24 * * page 493, line 36 - line 40 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/spe.4380200504
 [Y]  FRAIM L J, "SECURE OFFICE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM THE FIRST COMMODITY APPLICATION ON A TRUSTED SYSTEM", EXPLORING TECHNOLOGY - TODAY AND TOMORROW, DALLAS, OCT. 25 - 29, 1987, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19871025), no. -, pages 421 - 426, XP000092919 [Y] 1-3 * page 422, column L, line 32 - page 423, column L, line 33 *