Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0831223

EP0831223 - Control apparatus for internal combustion engine using air-amount-first fuel-amount-second control method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/13]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hosotani, Ichiro
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
02 / Tanako, Hiroshi
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
03 / Fuwa, Naohide
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
04 / Maeda, Iwao
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
05 / Kikori, Shigeo
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
06 / Kuretake, Ken
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
[1998/13]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/13]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date97116283.918.09.1997
[1998/13]
Priority number, dateJP1996024795219.09.1996         Original published format: JP 24795296
JP1996032696506.12.1996         Original published format: JP 32696596
[1998/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0831223
Date:25.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0831223
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0831223
Date:27.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/32, F02D33/02, F02D13/02, F02D41/10
[2000/16]
Former International [1998/13]F02D41/32, F02D33/02, F02D13/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/52]
Former [1998/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steuervorrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine mittels eines Verfahrens zur Steuerung erstens der Luft- und zweitens der Kraftstoffmenge[1998/13]
English:Control apparatus for internal combustion engine using air-amount-first fuel-amount-second control method[1998/13]
French:Dispositif de commande pour moteur à combustion interne avec méthode de commande du type air d'abord, carburant ensuite[1998/13]
Examination procedure18.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/13]
08.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2003Fee for grant paid
06.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH05296082  ;
 [AD]EP0135176  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [AD] 1,2,6 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940215), vol. 018, no. 090, Database accession no. (M - 1560), [X] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPH0733781B