Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0837300

EP0837300 - Procedure and apparatus for measuring the edges of objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/17]Procedure to measure the contours of objects
[2003/05]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For:DE  FR  IT 
Carl Zeiss
89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE
For:GB 
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung, trading as Carl Zeiss
89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE
[2003/28]
Former [1998/17]For:DE  FR  IT 
Carl Zeiss
D-89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE
For:GB 
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG, trading as CARL ZEISS
89518 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Breyer, Karl-Hermann, Dr.
Friedrich-Pfenning-Strasse 73
89518 Heidenheim / DE
02 / Götz, Klaus-Dieter
Schmiedgasse 8/1
74372 Sersheim / DE
03 / Beck, Rolf
Landenbergerstrasse 18
73728 Esslingen / DE
[1998/17]
Application number, filing date97116333.219.09.1997
[1998/17]
Priority number, dateDE199614331521.10.1996         Original published format: DE 19643315
DE199615406723.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19654067
[1998/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0837300
Date:22.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0837300
Date:21.03.2001
[2001/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0837300
Date:09.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/00, G01B11/02
[1998/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/50]
Former [1998/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vermessung von Werkstückkanten[2003/05]
English:Procedure and apparatus for measuring the edges of objects[2003/05]
French:Procédé et appareil pour mesurer des bordures d'objets[2003/05]
Former [1998/17]Verfahren zur Vermessung von Kanten an Werkstücken
Former [1998/17]Procedure to measure the contours of objects
Former [1998/17]Procédé de mesure de contours d'objets
Examination procedure25.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/43]
29.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2003Fee for grant paid
10.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR09.07.2003
GB09.07.2003
IT09.07.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]FR09.07.2003
GB09.07.2003
Former [2004/22]GB09.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]US5329359  (TACHIKAWA JIN) [X] 1-5,10,14-18,22,23,27,28 * column 2, line 5 - column 10, line 68; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US5412420  (ELLIS JAMES S) [X] 27,28 * column 2, line 6 - column 7, line 58; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]EP0726445  (MANNESMANN AG) [X] 27,28 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE2405102  (ZEISS CARL FA) [AD] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4623797  (EATON HOMER L ET AL) [A] 1-28 * column 1, line 6 - column 4, line 51; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]DE4109483  (ZEISS CARL FA) [AD] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0532169  (RENISHAW METROLOGY LTD) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *
ExaminationDE19736588