Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0831417

EP0831417 - Chipcards contacting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.12.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amphenol-Tuchel Electronics GmbH
August-Häusser-Strasse 10
74080 Heilbronn / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/13]For all designated states
AMPHENOL-TUCHEL ELECTRONICS GmbH
August-Häusser-Strasse 10
D-74080 Heilbronn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Reichardt, Manfred
Schlesienstrasse 23
74189 Weinsberg / DE
[1998/13]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [1998/13]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97116490.022.09.1997
[1998/13]
Priority number, dateDE199613862220.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19638622
[1998/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0831417
Date:25.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0831417
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10, G06K7/00
[2000/17]
Former International [1998/13]G06K7/10
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/01]
Former [1998/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Chipkarten-Kontaktiergerät[1998/13]
English:Chipcards contacting device[1998/13]
French:Dispositif pour contacter du cartes à puce[1998/13]
Examination procedure22.03.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
24.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
02.06.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
26.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/04]
19.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5012078  (PERNET MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 17 * * figures 5,6 * [Y] 5;
 [Y]US4605896  (OBRECHT WERNER [DE]) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 39 - line 49 * * figure 1 *;
 [DA]DE3810274  (AMPHENOL CORP [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3706836  (NIXDORF COMPUTER AG [DE]) [A] 4,10 * column 5, line 19 - line 38 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3641298  (RINAS WILFRIED [DE]) [A] 10 * claim 1 *