Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0833404

EP0833404 - An antenna array [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, Texas 75265 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/14]For all designated states
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas Texas 75265 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Miller, Darrell W.
823 Weeping Willow Court
Allen, TX 75002 / US
02 / Wheeler, Joseph E., III
3001 Collin Court
Plano, TX 75075 / US
03 / Gilliland, Paul C.
1109 Country Lane
Allen, TX 75002 / US
04 / Clements, Leslie D.
24 Crockett Court
Allen, Texas 75002 / US
[1998/14]
Representative(s)Degwert, Hartmut , et al
Prinz & Partner
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Degwert, Hartmut , et al
Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2003/12]Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Former [1998/14]Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing.
Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date97116712.725.09.1997
[1998/14]
Priority number, dateUS19960026768P26.09.1996         Original published format: US 26768 P
[1998/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0833404
Date:01.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0833404
Date:24.05.2000
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01Q21/06, H01Q21/08, H01Q9/30, H01Q9/32
[2000/11]
Former International [1998/14]H01Q21/06, H01Q21/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/05]
Former [1998/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gruppenantenne[1998/14]
English:An antenna array[1998/14]
French:Réseau d'antennes[1998/14]
Examination procedure07.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
24.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/20]
11.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/20]
Divisional application(s)EP03024914.8  / EP1385231
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]US3286268  (NORMAND BARBANO) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4;
 [A]US5313221  (DENTON JR ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [A]US4169266  (BACHVAROV HRISTO A) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US1914886  (SAMUEL FRANKLIN CHARLES) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4763131  (ROSSER WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4700197  (MILNE ROBERT [CA]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5479176  (ZAVREL JR ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *