EP0836100 - Laser along-body tracker (SABOT) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW INC. One Space Park Redondo Beach California 90278 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states TRW Inc. One Space Park Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Livingston, Peter M. 1321 Via Zumaya Palos Verdes Estates, CA 90274 / US | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97117322.4 | 07.10.1997 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | US19960729108 | 11.10.1996 Original published format: US 729108 | [1998/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0836100 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0836100 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/66, F41G3/04 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
G01S17/66 (EP,KR,US);
F41G3/04 (EP,US);
F41H13/005 (EP,US);
G01S17/86 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/16] | G01S17/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/45] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Laserverfolgungsvorrichtung längs des Körpers (SABOT) | [1998/16] | English: | Laser along-body tracker (SABOT) | [1998/16] | French: | Dispositif de poursuite à laser le long du coprs (SABOT) | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1408230 (ELTRO GMBH) [A] 1,10* page 2, column L, line 11 - column R, line 111; figure . *; | [A]US4047816 (PELL KYNRIC M, et al) [A] 1,10 * column A * * column 2, line 4 - column 5, line 53; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]US4063819 (HAYES CECIL L) [X] 10 * column A * * column 2, line 21 - column 5, line 6; figures 1-3 * [A] 1,2; | [XA]US4123165 (BROWN DAVID B, et al) [X] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 11 - column 5, line 58; figures 1-7 * [A] 5,6,10; | [A]FR2601782 (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,6,10 * abstract * * page 3, line 37 - page 6, line 2; figure . *; | [AD]US5198607 (LIVINGSTON PETER M [US], et al) [AD] 1,10 * column A * * column 3, line 66 - column 8, line 26; figures 1-6 * |