Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0836255

EP0836255 - Laser diode array and fabrication method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2003  [2003/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1998/16]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamaguchi, Masayuki
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Yamazaki, Hiroyuki
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Kudo, Koji
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1998/16]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/16]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date97117422.208.10.1997
[1998/16]
Priority number, dateJP1996026700608.10.1996         Original published format: JP 26700696
[1998/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0836255
Date:15.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0836255
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01S5/40, H01S5/026
[2000/52]
Former International [1998/16]H01S3/25, H01S3/025
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1999/01]
Former [1998/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Laserdioden-Array und Herstellungsverfahren[1998/16]
English:Laser diode array and fabrication method thereof[1998/16]
French:Réseau laser à diode et méthode de fabrication[1998/16]
Examination procedure18.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/17]
21.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2001Fee for grant paid
18.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US5561682  (AOKI MASAHIRO ET AL) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 44 * * column 3, line 1 - line 46 * * column 5, line 6 - line 10 * * column 7, line 11 - column 8, line 5; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]JPH02310986  ;
 [A]EP0732785  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910313), vol. 015, no. 106, Database accession no. (E - 1044), & JP02310986 A 19901226 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,4,6-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - FURUSHIMA Y ET AL, "WIDE TEMPERATURE RANGE OPERATION OF 1.3 MUM STRAINED MQW LAMBDA/4-SHIFTED DFB-LDS FOR 2.5 GB/S TRANSMISSION MODULES WITHOUT TEMPERATURE CONTROL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, (19950917), vol. 2, pages 537 - 540, XP002024696 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KATOH Y ET AL, "FOUR-WAVELENGTH DBR LASER ARRAY USING SELECTIVE MOCVD GROWTH", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART II - ELECTRONICS, (19940701), vol. 77, no. 7, pages 21 - 26, XP000493752 [A] 1-9 * page 22, column R - page 25, column R *