Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0835809

EP0835809 - Tool for tying an article,particularly a bundle of cables [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HellermannTyton GmbH
Siemensstrasse 5
25421 Pinneberg / DE
[1999/37]
Former [1998/16]For all designated states
Paul Hellermann GmbH
Siemensstrasse 5
25421 Pinneberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kurmis, Viktor
Rethwiese 34
25421 Pinneberg / DE
[1998/16]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/16]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Liebherrstrasse 20
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97117425.508.10.1997
[1998/16]
Priority number, dateDE1996217651U10.10.1996         Original published format: DE 29617651 U
[1998/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0835809
Date:15.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0835809
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:B65B13/02
[1998/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT,   SE [1999/01]
Former [1998/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anordnung zum Binden eines Gegenstands, insbesondere eines Kabelbaums[1998/16]
English:Tool for tying an article,particularly a bundle of cables[1998/16]
French:Dispositif pour encercler un objet, en particulier un faisceau de câbles[1998/16]
Examination procedure06.08.1998Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.08.1998Examination requested  [1998/41]
07.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
07.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
20.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.1999Fee for grant paid
06.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US5351386  (CHANG KUN-SHENG [TW]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 8 - line 57; figure - *;
 [A]EP0428116  (HELLERMANN GMBH P [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 34; figure - *;
 [A]FR2401742  (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 12, line 7 - page 13, line 29; figure - *
ExaminationUS5205328
by applicantEP0596363