blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0851050

EP0851050 - Method for manufacturing a tubular knitted article [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
H. Stoll GmbH & Co.
Stollweg 1
72760 Reutlingen / DE
[2003/37]
Former [1998/27]For all designated states
H. Stoll GmbH & Co.
Stollweg 1
D-72760 Reutlingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Nonnenmacher, Thomas
Schwalbenstrasse 7
72124 Pliezhausen / DE
02 / Schmidt, Henning
Pappelweg 62
72770 Reutlingen / DE
03 / Schwenk, Jürgen
Jos.-Niklasweg 15
72379 Hechingen / DE
04 / Ulmer, Achim
Gehlhalde 5
72532 Gomadingen / DE
[1998/27]
Representative(s)Möbus, Daniela, et al
Patentanwältin Dr. Möbus Kaiserstrasse 85
72764 Reutlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]Möbus, Daniela, Dr.-Ing., et al
Patentanwältin Dr. Möbus Kaiserstrasse 85
72764 Reutlingen / DE
Former [1998/27]Möbus, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Möbus, Dr.-Ing. Daniela Möbus, Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Schwan, Hindenburgstrasse 65
72762 Reutlingen / DE
Application number, filing date97117637.511.10.1997
[1998/27]
Priority number, dateDE199615402721.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19654027
[1998/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0851050
Date:01.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0851050
Date:06.05.1999
[1999/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0851050
Date:10.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.1999
ClassificationIPC:D04B1/22
[1998/27]
CPC:
D04B1/106 (EP); D04B1/246 (EP); D10B2403/0333 (EP)
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/10]
Former [2000/03]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB 
Former [1998/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines schlauchförmigen Gestricks[1998/27]
English:Method for manufacturing a tubular knitted article[1998/27]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d'un tricot tubulaire[1998/27]
Examination procedure22.09.1999Examination requested  [1999/47]
09.11.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2002Fee for grant paid
06.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.04.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
04.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.01.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YA]CH247210  (KÄRGER) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,3;
 [YA]DE2035849  (ELITEX ZAVODY) [Y] 1 * figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.