Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0822131

EP0822131 - Parallelogram lift axle suspension system with a control for axle caster adjustment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE BOLER COMPANY.
500 Park Boulevard, Suite 1010
Itasca, Illinois 60143-1285 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
THE BOLER COMPANY.
500 Park Boulevard, Suite 1010
Itasca, Illinois 60143-1285 / US
Former [1998/06]For all designated states
THE BOLER COMPANY.
500 Park Boulevard, Suite 1010
Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Keeler, Michael J.
1065 Poppy Hills Drive
Black Lick, Ohio 43003 / US
02 / Gottschalk, Michael J.
108 Donegal Drive
Grandville, Ohio 44023 / US
[1998/06]
Representative(s)Prato, Roberto , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/06]Prato, Roberto , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date97117789.405.08.1994
[1998/06]
Priority number, dateUS1993016293908.12.1993         Original published format: US 162939
[1998/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0822131
Date:04.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0822131
Date:25.11.1998
[1998/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0822131
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B62D17/00, B62D61/12
[1998/48]
Former International [1998/06]B62D17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/06]
Extension statesSI23.10.1997
TitleGerman:Lift-Achsen-Aufhängungssystem in Form eines Parallelogramms mit Steuerung der Achsen-Schwenkeinstellung[1998/06]
English:Parallelogram lift axle suspension system with a control for axle caster adjustment[1998/06]
French:Suspension en forme de parallélogramme pour essieu relevable avec contrôle de réglage de la châsse de l'essieu[1998/06]
Examination procedure11.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/27]
08.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2002Fee for grant paid
04.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94112260.8  / EP0662418
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
17.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
17.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
08.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
19.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FR20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
IT20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
DK20.02.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
IE05.08.2003
LU05.08.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2007/17]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FR20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
DK20.02.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
IE05.08.2003
LU05.08.2003
Former [2006/14]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FR20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
IE05.08.2003
LU05.08.2003
Former [2004/40]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
IE05.08.2003
LU05.08.2003
Former [2004/39]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
LU05.08.2003
Former [2004/04]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2003/51]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/39]AT20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/30]NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE20.02.2003
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2257670  (RUBERY OWEN ROCKWELL LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-8 * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1; figure 2 *;
 [Y]GB2262722  (VANRADEN IND [US]) [Y] 1-6 * page 11, line 16 - line 38; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US4773670  (RAIDEL II JOHN E [US]) [Y] 7,8 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 37; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4783096  (RAMSEY JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 6; figure 2 *