blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0848436

EP0848436 - Separator material for alkaline storage batteries [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2002
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.04.2002  [2002/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/25]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Gomikawa, Kaori
2-12-4-413, Nishikaigan
Tsujido, Fujisawa City, 251 / JP
02 / Yokoo, Sadaaki
1891-5, Kosuzume-cho, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama City, 244 / JP
03 / Yuasa, Kohji
1-13, Heiwa-cho
Chigasaki City, 253 / JP
[1998/25]
Representative(s)Jung, Elisabeth, et al
Jung HML Patentanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3
80799 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/25]Jung, Elisabeth, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte, Dr. Elisabeth Jung, Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn, Claus Gernhardt, Postfach 40 14 68
80714 München / DE
Application number, filing date97117952.816.10.1997
[1998/25]
Priority number, dateJP1996033330213.12.1996         Original published format: JP 33330296
[1998/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0848436
Date:17.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0848436
Date:26.05.1999
[1999/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.1999
ClassificationIPC:H01M2/16, H01M10/34
[1998/25]
CPC:
H01M50/44 (EP); H01M50/417 (EP,US); H01M2300/0014 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/05]
Former [1998/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Separatorenmaterial für alkalische Speicherbatterien[1998/25]
English:Separator material for alkaline storage batteries[1998/25]
French:Materiau de séparateur pour les accumulateurs alcalins[1998/25]
Examination procedure16.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/25]
09.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/14]
26.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200105   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0436954  ;
 [A]JPH08138645  ;
 [A]JPS55105962  ;
 [E]JPH103937  ;
 [X]WO9620505  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al);
 [PX]EP0795916  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [PX] 1,8 * examples 6-8; claim 1; table 3 *;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920520), vol. 016, no. 215, Database accession no. (E - 1204), & JP04036954 A 19920206 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2,8,9 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 32, Database accession no. 96-314451, XP002098673 & JPH08138645 A 19960531 (DAIWABO CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801104), vol. 004, no. 157, Database accession no. (E - 032), & JP55105962 A 19800814 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2,4,5,8-11 * abstract *
 [E]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 098, no. 005, & JP10003937 A 19980106 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACH CO LTD) [E] 1,8 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.