EP0851136 - Pressure plate assembly for automotive vehicle with automatic wear adjusting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannesmann Sachs Aktiengesellschaft Ernst-Sachs-Strasse 62 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | [1998/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bayer, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. Kerbfeld 66 97491 Aidhausen / DE | [1998/27] | Application number, filing date | 97118028.6 | 17.10.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | DE1996149135 | 27.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19649135 | [1998/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0851136 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0851136 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | [1999/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0851136 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/75 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
F16D13/757 (EP,US);
F16D13/71 (EP,US);
F16D2013/581 (EP,US);
F16D2013/706 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1999/40] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckplattenbaugruppe, insbesondere für eine Kraftfahrzeug-Reibungskupplung mit automatischem Verschleissausgleich | [1998/27] | English: | Pressure plate assembly for automotive vehicle with automatic wear adjusting device | [1998/27] | French: | Ensemble plateau de pression pour un embrayage à friction d'une voiture automobile avec rattrapage d'usure automatique. | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 27.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AY]GB2187520 (DAIKIN MFG CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 19; | [AY]US4738344 (MARUYAMANO SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 9, paragraph 3; figures 7,8 * [Y] 19; | [DA]DE4306688 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) | by applicant | DE4306688 |