blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0838713

EP0838713 - Liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimizu, Akiko
2-29-7-A108, Oike
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Hishinuma, Takahiro
2-10-3-338, Sonehigashi-machi
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP
03 / Higashi, Koji
2-1-2-224, Kuwata-cho
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP
[1998/18]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1998/18]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97118532.724.10.1997
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateJP1996028409225.10.1996         Original published format: JP 28409296
JP1996028409125.10.1996         Original published format: JP 28409196
[1998/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0838713
Date:29.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0838713
Date:08.07.1998
[1998/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.1998
ClassificationIPC:G02F1/1335
[1998/18]
CPC:
G02F1/133632 (EP,KR); G02B5/3083 (KR); G02F1/133634 (EP,KR);
G02B5/3016 (KR); G02F1/13363 (EP); G02F2203/66 (KR)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1999/12]
Former [1998/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung[1998/18]
English:Liquid crystal display device[1998/18]
French:Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide[1998/18]
Examination procedure22.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/09]
29.08.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200004   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5528400  (ARAKAWA KOHEI [JP]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 7 * * column 20, line 1 - column 21, line 13 * * column 22, line 18 - line 38; figures 1,2,7 *;
 [DA]EP0676660  (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [DA] 1-4 * page 6, line 38 - page 9, line 17; figure 8; table 1 *;
 [PX]US5638200  (XU GANG [US]) [PX] 1 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 9 * * column 5, line 12 - column 7, line 23; figures 5,6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.