Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0838644

EP0838644 - Method and device for defrosting a cooler of a refrigeration plant [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meyer, Friedhelm
Hof Geisenberg 1
57319 Bad Berleburg / DE
[2004/25]
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
MEYER, Friedhelm
Hof Geisenberg 1
57319 Bad Berleburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/18]
Representative(s)Klingseisen, Franz , et al
Klingseisen, Rings & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Klingseisen, Franz , et al
Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
Former [1998/18]Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
Application number, filing date97118534.324.10.1997
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateDE199614448825.10.1996         Original published format: DE 19644488
[1998/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0838644
Date:29.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0838644
Date:07.06.2000
[2000/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0838644
Date:16.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:F25D21/06
[1998/18]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   GB,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [2001/07]
Former [1998/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abtauen eines Kühlers einer Kälteanlage[1998/18]
English:Method and device for defrosting a cooler of a refrigeration plant[1998/18]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour dégivrer un refroidisseur d'une installation de réfrigération[1998/18]
Examination procedure07.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
08.12.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.04.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, MC, PT
09.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2004Fee for grant paid
06.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.01.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU24.10.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
[2015/21]
Former [2007/17]LU24.10.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
Former [2006/12]BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
Former [2005/51]BE31.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US3675441  (PEREZ ARTHUR) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2954680  (RUFF ALONZO W) [A] 6,10 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 28; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3012541  (LAHMEYER AG [DE]) [A] 6 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2693682  (MILTON WINGER, et al) [A] 6 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 45; figure 1 *