Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0838309

EP0838309 - Tool with multiple toggle mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Connectool GmbH & Co.
Am Stoppelkamp 17
32758 Detmold / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
connectool GmbH & Co.
Am Stoppelkamp 17
32758 Detmold / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Undin, Pär
Mistelvägen 17
18435 Akersberga / SE
02 / Undin, Hans
Annavägen 8
18457 Österskär / SE
[1998/18]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/18]TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date97118559.024.10.1997
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateDE199614480728.10.1996         Original published format: DE 19644807
[1998/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0838309
Date:29.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0838309
Date:22.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.01.1998
ClassificationInternational:B25B7/12, B25B27/14
[1998/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1999/02]
Former [1998/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Werkzeug mit einem Mehrfach-Kniehebelmechanismus[1998/18]
English:Tool with multiple toggle mechanism[1998/18]
French:Outil avec mécanisme à genouillère multiple[1998/18]
Examination procedure24.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/18]
06.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.1999Fee for grant paid
17.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES22.03.2000
FR22.03.2000
GB22.03.2000
IT22.03.2000
SE22.03.2000
AT24.10.2000
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]ES22.03.2000
FR22.03.2000
GB22.03.2000
SE22.03.2000
AT24.10.2000
Former [2002/27]ES22.03.2000
GB22.03.2000
SE22.03.2000
FR18.08.2000
AT24.10.2000
Former [2002/23]GB22.03.2000
SE22.03.2000
FR18.08.2000
AT24.10.2000
Former [2002/15]GB22.03.2000
FR18.08.2000
AT24.10.2000
Former [2001/16]GB22.03.2000
FR18.08.2000
Former [2001/12]GB22.03.2000
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4934204  (HADDEN SR EDWARD L [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 12, line 66 - line 68; figures 3,21,23,24 * [Y] 6;
 [XY]US2496309  (PUGH WALTER E) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 6;
 [XY]US2096016  (CHESTER WEISHAMPEL ROBERT) [X] 1-5 * page 2, column L, line 64 - column R, line 4; figure 7 * [Y] 6;
 [XY]DE1478966  (KASPER OTTO) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 4 - line 16; figures 1,3 * [Y] 6;
 [X]GB932218  (SPEED TOOLS LTD) [X] 1,2 * figures 3,4 *;
 [DY]DE4101284  (WEIDMUELLER C A GMBH CO [DE]) [DY] 6 * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0344826  (WEIDMUELLER C A GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figure 3 *