Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0845410

EP0845410 - Leading edge for an aerodynamic surface and fabrication method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Deutschland GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
[2002/06]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
EADS Airbus GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Former [1999/12]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler Aerospace Airbus Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Former [1998/23]For all designated states
Daimler-Benz Aerospace Airbus Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kränzien, Peter
Wientapperweg 9 G
22589 Hamburg / DE
[1998/23]
Representative(s)Hansmann, Dierk
Patentanwälte
Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann
Jessenstrasse 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/23]Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date97118620.027.10.1997
[1998/23]
Priority number, dateDE199614913227.11.1996         Original published format: DE 19649132
[1998/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0845410
Date:03.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0845410
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0845410
Date:15.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B64C21/06
[1998/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
Former [1998/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nase für eine aerodynamische Fläche und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung[1998/23]
English:Leading edge for an aerodynamic surface and fabrication method therefor[1998/23]
French:Bord d'attaque pour une surface aérodynamique et procédé pour sa fabrication[1998/23]
Examination procedure07.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
26.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2002Fee for grant paid
27.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02]
Request for further processing for:22.03.2002Request for further processing filed
22.03.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.04.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US5316032  (DECOUX STEVEN P [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 38 *;
 [A]DE4436748  (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AIRBUS [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 6 - line 57 *;
 [A]EP0679572  (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [DA]EP0665097  (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0665097