blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0823396

EP0823396 - Improvements in or relating to counter-balancing load carriers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vitec Group plc
Western Way Bury St. Edmunds
Suffolk IP33 3TB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/07]For all designated states
Vitec Group plc
Western Way
Bury St. Edmunds, Suffolk IP33 3TB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Lindsay, Richard Arthur
2 St. Mary's Close, Gislingham
Eye, Suffolk IP23 8HW / GB
[1998/07]
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/07]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date97118872.701.12.1993
[1998/07]
Priority number, dateGB1992002510201.12.1992         Original published format: GB 9225102
GB1993000270011.02.1993         Original published format: GB 9302700
[1998/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0823396
Date:11.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0823396
Date:18.03.1998
[1998/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0823396
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.1998
ClassificationIPC:B66F11/04, F16M11/04, F16M11/12, F16M11/42
[1998/12]
CPC:
F16M11/18 (EP); B66F11/048 (EP); F16M11/10 (EP);
F16M11/2064 (EP); F16M11/2092 (EP); F16M11/42 (EP);
F16M13/00 (EP); F16M2200/044 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [1998/07]B66F11/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/07]
TitleGerman:Ausgeglichener Lastenträger[1998/07]
English:Improvements in or relating to counter-balancing load carriers[1998/07]
French:Support de charge contre-balancé[1998/07]
Examination procedure30.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/07]
07.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2001Fee for grant paid
18.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94900957.5  / EP0725758
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
16.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
19.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR27.03.2002
IT27.03.2002
ES25.09.2002
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]FR27.03.2002
ES25.09.2002
Former [2004/04]ES25.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2611826  (MASSERON ET AL.) [A] 1,3-5,10,17 * abstract * * page 4, line 18 - line 27 * * page 8, line 9 - line 18 * * page 9, line 13 - line 25 * * page 17, line 7 - line 25 * * figures 1,4,5 *;
 [A]GB2207109  (MASSERON ET AL.) [A] 1-4,9,10,17 * abstract * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 4 * * page 15, paragraph L * * page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 33, line 6 - line 22 *;
 [A]US4943019  (MESTER) [A] 1,3,9,10,17 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - line 46 * * column 3, line 15 - line 23 *;
 [A]DE3334428  (HELLER) [A] 1-3,13,17 * figures 5,6 * * page 13, the last 6 lines ( fig. 5 ) * * page 14, second paragraph - page 15, line 7 ( fig. 6 ) *;
 [A]GB2043026  (MARK INDUSTRIES) [A] 1 * figure 2 * * page 2, line 6 - line 12 *;
 [A]US4775029  (MAC DONALD ET AL.) [A] 1 * figures 1,4,5 * * column 4, line 44 - line 60 *;
 [A]DE2828694  (SALOMATIN ET AL.) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [DA]GB2163720  (W VINTEN LTD.) [DA] 9,10 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - line 29 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.