13.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
07.10.2005 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 23.11.2005 [2005/47] |
21.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
21.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
22.11.2004 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
22.10.2004 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
13.08.2004 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
13.08.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
18.06.2004 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
12.02.2004 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
20.01.2004 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
19.01.2004 |
Opposition filed |
published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
21.02.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] |
08.01.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.10.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.07.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.12.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.08.2001 |
First examination report |
|
21.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.11.2000 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
17.04.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
25.02.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
25.02.2000 |
Change - designated states |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
18.02.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] |
09.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.06.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] |
11.06.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
05.06.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] |