Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29624464U | 26.02.2004 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE19654197 | 23.12.1996 | DE29624464 | 23.12.1996 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0854232 | ![]() | 09.04.2003 | B1 | EP0854232 | 28.07.1999 | A3 | EP0854232 | 22.07.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19654197 | 23.12.1996 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19654197 | 25.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19654197 | 23.12.1996 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59709775D1 | 15.05.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19654197 | 23.12.1996 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6083349 | 04.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19654197 | 23.12.1996 |