Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0857685

EP0857685 - Load clamping and lifting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2003  [2003/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Notsu Unso Kabushiki Kaisha
908-5 Ooaza-Hatakenaka Ooita-shi
Ooita 870 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/33]For all designated states
Notsu Unso Kabushiki Kaisha
908-5 Ooaza-Hatakenaka
Ooita-shi, Ooita 870 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yakushinji, Kuniaki
Notsu Unso Kabushiki Kaisha, 908-5 Ooza-Hatakenaka
Ooita-shi, Ooita 870 / JP
[1998/33]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/33]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date97119350.305.11.1997
[1998/33]
Priority number, dateJP1997002837727.01.1997         Original published format: JP 2837797
JP1997012163323.04.1997         Original published format: JP 12163397
JP1997023184312.08.1997         Original published format: JP 23184397
[1998/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0857685
Date:12.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0857685
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B66C1/42
[2000/01]
Former International [1998/33]B66B1/42
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/37]
Former [1998/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lastklemm- und Hebevorrichtung[1998/33]
English:Load clamping and lifting apparatus[1998/33]
French:Appareil de serrage et de levage d'une charge[1998/33]
Examination procedure09.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
27.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/18]
13.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB1442301  (REDLAND TILES LTD) [X] 1,2,5 * page 1, line 17 - line 50 * * page 2, line 52 - page 3, column 64 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 6,7;
 [X]GB886706  (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) [X] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB1224694  (HERBERT MORRIS BROWN LENOX LTD [GB]) [X] 1,8 * page 1, line 13 - line 21 * * page 1, line 55 - line 85 * * figures 1-5,10 *;
 [Y]US2794669  (ALOYSIUS SCHARDINGER) [Y] 6 * figures 1,4 *;
 [Y]US3297353  (CARLSON ERNA L) [Y] 7 * figure 1 *