Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0841105

EP0841105 - Method for extruding of a cup-shaped part [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Anton Holzhauer Umformtechnik
Scheererstrasse 9
72517 Sigmaringendorf / DE
[1998/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Holzhauer, Anton, Dipl.-Ing.
Hans-Hinger-Strasse 14
72517 Sigmaringendorf / DE
[1998/20]
Representative(s)Hering, Hartmut
Patentanwälte
Berendt, Leyh & Hering
Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/20]Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date97119363.605.11.1997
[1998/20]
Priority number, dateDE199614595407.11.1996         Original published format: DE 19645954
[1998/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0841105
Date:13.05.1998
Language:DE
[1998/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0841105
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0841105
Date:26.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B21C23/32, B21C23/20, B21C23/18
[1998/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/46]
Former [2000/40](deleted) 
Former [1998/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Fliesspressen eines napfförmigen Teils[1998/20]
English:Method for extruding of a cup-shaped part[1998/20]
French:Procédé pour le filage d'une pièce en forme de godet[1998/20]
Examination procedure24.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
26.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2002Fee for grant paid
11.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
22.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000ES   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
22.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
22.08.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
22.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
22.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB26.03.2003
IT26.03.2003
SE26.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2004/22]GB26.03.2003
SE26.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2004/04]SE26.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2003/50]SE26.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH07256387  ;
 [A]BE551053  (FORGES DE ZEEBRUGES SA) [A] 1 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 13; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]JPH01215427  ;
 [A]US4129022  (THONNES HORST, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 10; figures 1-4; claim 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, [A] 1,3-5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891122), vol. 013, no. 526, Database accession no. (M - 897), [A] 1 * abstract *