Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0922663

EP0922663 - Elevator, in particular traction sheave elevator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.09.2009  [2009/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thyssen Aufzugswerke GmbH
Bernhäuser Strasse 45
73765 Neuhausen a.d.F. / DE
[1999/48]
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
THYSSEN AUFZÜGE GMBH
Bernhäuserstrasse 45
73765 Neuhausen a.d.F. / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Reuter, Günter, Dr.-Ing.
Amselweg 23
70794 Filderstadt / DE
02 / Frhr. von Scholley, Hans Ferdinand, Dipl.-Ing.
Albstrasse 26/1
72649 Wolfschlugen / DE
03 / Vogler, Eberhard, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Keplerstrasse 6
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
04 / Untergasser, Hans
Max-Eyth-Strasse 17
73765 Neuhausen a.d.F. / DE
[1999/24]
Representative(s)Hössle, Markus , et al
Hössle Kudlek & Partner Postfach 10 23 38
70019 Stuttgart / DE
[2009/39]
Former [1999/31]Hössle, Markus, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Hössle & Kudlek Patentanwälte Moserstrasse 8
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1999/24]Raeck, Wilfrid, Dipl.-Ing.
Raeck & Hössle Patentanwälte Moserstrasse 8
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date97119575.508.11.1997
[1999/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0922663
Date:16.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0922663
Date:28.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP29.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:B66B11/00, B66B5/28
[1999/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/08]
Former [1999/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Aufzug, insbesondere Treibscheibenaufzug[1999/24]
English:Elevator, in particular traction sheave elevator[1999/24]
French:Ascenseur, en particulier ascenseur à poulie[1999/24]
Examination procedure28.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/24]
01.04.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
03.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
14.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.1999Fee for grant paid
07.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.12.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.03.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT
Opposition(s)29.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.01.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0646537  (KONE OY [FI]) [AD] 1 * column 4, line 37 - line 50; figure 4 *;
 [X]JPH0356378  ;
 [X]NL9100059  (OTIS LIFTEN B V) [X] 9-11 * page 3, line 14 - page 5, line 25; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]FR539740  (HELLER CARL) [X] 9-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9723399  (MACUGA HENRY J [US]) [A] 9-11 * abstract *;
 [A]US1392962  (MURPHY JOHN M) [A] 9-11 * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 21; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]EP0129678  (GMV SERVICE SRL [IT]) [AD] 9 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 19; figures 1,2 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910528), vol. 015, no. 208, Database accession no. (M - 1117), [X] 9-11 * abstract *