Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0846463

EP0846463 - Active substance containing plaster [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.02.2004  [2004/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft
Unnastrasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
[1998/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Himmelsbach, Peter
Rübker Strasse 16a
21614 Buxtehude / DE
02 / Linder, Helmut, Dr.
Graf-Anton-Weg 53f
22459 Hamburg / DE
03 / Broschk, Katharina
Eppendorfer Weg 200
20253 Hamburg / DE
04 / Sinnen, Marike
Feldstrasse 62
25421 Pinneberg / DE
05 / Wasner, Matthias
Rothenhauschaussee 75
21029 Hamburg / DE
[1998/24]
Application number, filing date97119880.913.11.1997
[1998/24]
Priority number, dateDE199615047105.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19650471
[1998/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0846463
Date:10.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0846463
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0846463
Date:26.02.2003
Language:DE
[2003/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/70, A61L15/58
[1998/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/50]
Former [1998/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wirkstoffhaltige Pflaster[1998/24]
English:Active substance containing plaster[1998/24]
French:Pansement adhésif contenant un médicament[1998/24]
Examination procedure12.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
14.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
30.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2002Fee for grant paid
13.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08]
Request for further processing for:05.10.2001Request for further processing filed
05.10.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.10.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
04.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
06.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0305756  (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,11 * abstract * * column 6, line 9 - line 20 *;
 [DX]DE4224325  (SANOL ARZNEI SCHWARZ GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-3,7-9,12-15 * page 3, line 29 - line 45 *;
 [A]US5306503  (MUELLER WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,14 * column 5, line 15 - line 25 * * example 4 * * claims 1,14-16 *