Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0845750

EP0845750 - Double connector for two chip cards [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.01.2005  [2005/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TYCO Electronics Logistics AG
AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Logistics AG
AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / CH
Former [1998/23]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidt, Helge
Am Wogbach 33
67346 Speyer / DE
02 / Ackermann, Gerhard
Albrecht-Dürer-Weg 10
68804 Altlussheim / DE
[1998/23]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/19]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Former [2001/06]Hirsch, Peter
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Former [2000/14]Heinz-Schäfer, Marion
AMP International Enterprises Limited AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach (SG) / CH
Application number, filing date97120033.214.11.1997
[1998/23]
Priority number, dateDE199614959829.11.1996         Original published format: DE 19649598
[1998/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0845750
Date:03.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0845750
Date:29.11.2000
[2000/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/00
[1998/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/34]
Former [2001/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FI,  FR,  GB,  LI 
Former [1998/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Doppelstöckiger Stecker für zwei Chipkarten[1998/23]
English:Double connector for two chip cards[1998/23]
French:Connecteur double pour deux cartes à puce[1998/23]
Examination procedure15.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
30.05.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.10.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, LI
18.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/04]
24.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2298743  (KENVEN DEVELOPMENTS LIMITED) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0605204  (WHITAKER CORP) [A] 1 * the whole document *