blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0844123

EP0844123 - A side part for a motor vehicle, particularly a coupé, having longitudinally-slidable doors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marchetti, Ernesto
Corso Francia 333/8
10142 Torino / IT
[1998/22]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/22]
Representative(s)Serra, Francesco, et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8
10152 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/22]Serra, Francesco, et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date97120088.617.11.1997
[1998/22]
Priority number, dateIT1996TO0093920.11.1996         Original published format: IT TO960939
[1998/22]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0844123
Date:27.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0844123
Date:08.09.1999
[1999/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0844123
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.1999
ClassificationIPC:B60J5/06
[1998/22]
CPC:
B60J5/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/20]
Former [1998/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein Seitenteil für ein Motorfahrzeug, insbesondere ein Coupe, mit längsverschiebbaren Türen[1998/22]
English:A side part for a motor vehicle, particularly a coupé, having longitudinally-slidable doors[1998/22]
French:Une partie latérale pour un véhicule à moteur, en particulier un coupé, comprenant des portes pouvant coulisser longitudinalement[1998/22]
Examination procedure14.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
09.03.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.06.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT
30.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2003Fee for grant paid
14.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
17.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.04.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH04.02.2004
FR04.02.2004
IT04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
SE04.05.2004
DE05.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]CH04.02.2004
FR04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
SE04.05.2004
DE05.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2005/12]CH04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
SE04.05.2004
DE05.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2004/46]CH04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2004/44]CH04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
SE04.05.2004
Former [2004/40]SE04.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]GB738486  (RONALD ROBERT STEWART CHARTERI) [X] 1,5,8,11 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]FR1424500  (DELMAS) [X] 1,4,5,11 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US3594036  (CADIOU JEAN G);
 [A]GB1316779  (TRANSPORTATION TECHNOLOGY);
 [A]US4068407  (PODOLAN EDWARD G, et al);
 [X]GB2126173  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,4,5,8,11 * page 1, line 4 - page 2, line 4; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.