Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0843514

EP0843514 - Method and mounting apparatus for mounting a component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha
2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/21]For all designated states
YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken, 438 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hanamura, N.
c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K., 2500, Shingai
Iwata-Shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
[1998/21]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97120210.618.11.1997
[1998/21]
Priority number, dateJP1996030690918.11.1996         Original published format: JP 30690996
[1998/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0843514
Date:20.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0843514
Date:07.04.1999
[1999/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0843514
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:H05K13/04
[1998/21]
Designated contracting statesDE [1999/51]
Former [1998/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Montage von Bauteilen[1998/21]
English:Method and mounting apparatus for mounting a component[1998/21]
French:Méthode et appareil de montage de composants[1998/21]
Examination procedure30.09.1999Examination requested  [1999/48]
08.10.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.02.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) NL
27.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2003Fee for grant paid
15.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.11.1999NL   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPH07162194  ;
 [A]GB2183820  (DYNAPERT PRECIMA LTD) [A] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * page 4, line 6 - page 4, line 77; figure 1 * * page 6, line 117 - page 7, line 4 *;
 [A]US5329692  (KASHIWAGI YASUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,3-6,8-10 * column 3, line 9 - column 3, line 21; figures 1,3,8 * * column 5, line 36 - column 5, line 46 *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 095, no. 009, & JP07162194 A 19950623 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DA] 1,5,6,10 * abstract *