Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0859340

EP0859340 - Method for verifying the expected postage security device and its status [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.12.2004  [2004/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pitney Bowes Inc.
World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road
Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/34]For all designated states
PITNEY BOWES INC.
World Headquarters, One Elmcroft Road
Stamford Connecticut 06926-0700 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ryan, Frederick W., Jr.
4 Naples Lane
Oxford, Connecticut 06478 / US
02 / Cordery, Robert A.
11 1/2 Jeanette Street
Danbury, Conn. 06811 / US
[1998/34]
Representative(s)Avery, Stephen John , et al
Hoffmann Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/34]Avery, Stephen John , et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date97120460.721.11.1997
[1998/34]
Priority number, dateUS1996075457821.11.1996         Original published format: US 754578
[1998/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0859340
Date:19.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0859340
Date:13.09.2000
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07B17/00
[1998/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/22]
Former [1998/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Überprüfen der erwarteten Frankiersicherheitsvorrichtung und ihres Zustandes[1998/34]
English:Method for verifying the expected postage security device and its status[1998/34]
French:Dispositif pour vérifier le dispositif de sécurité d'affranchissement prévu et son état[1998/34]
Examination procedure07.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
15.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/50]
07.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0388843  (ALCATEL SATMAM [FR]) [Y] 5,7,10 * column 2, line 14 - line 41 * * column 9, line 40 - line 42 * [A] 1-4,6,8,9,11-13;
 [Y]EP0298776  (ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS [GB]) [Y] 5,7,10 * column 5, line 23 - line 62 *;
 [A]US4935961  (GARGIULO JOSEPH L [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 60 - line 68 * * column 2, line 23 - line 32 * * column 2, line 50 - line 59 *;
 [A]GB2233937  (PITNEY BOWES PLC [GB]) [A] 1-13 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 16 *;
 [A]US4802218  (WRIGHT CHRISTOPHER B [US], et al) [A] 12 * column 9, line 44 - column 10, line 52 *
 [A]  Information Based Indicia Program Host System Specification [Draft], UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, XP002142880 [A] 1-13 * pages 3-1, paragraph 3.1.2 *