Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0860946

EP0860946 - Switch circuit having excess-current detection function [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.09.2002
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.10.2002  [2002/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harness System Technologies Research, Ltd.
7-10, Kikuzumi 1-chome, Minami-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi / JP
For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi
Mie-ken / JP
For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
Harness System Technologies Research, Ltd.
7-10, Kikuzumi 1-chome, Minami-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP
For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mizuno, Fumiaki, c/o Harness Syst.Techn. Res., Ltd
7-10, Kikuzumi 1-chome, Minami-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
02 / Hoshino, Takashi c/o Harness Syst.Techn. Res., Ltd
7-10 , Kikuzumi 1-chome, Minami-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
03 / Kido, Motonori, c/o Harness Syst.Techn. Res., Ltd
7-10 , Kikuzumi 1-chome, Minami-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
04 / Miyazaki, Yoshiyuki, Harness Syst.Techn. Res., Ltd
7-10 , Kikuzumi 1-chome, Minami-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
[1998/35]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]R.A. KUHNEN & P.A. WACKER
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Former [1998/35]KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date97120503.421.11.1997
[1998/35]
Priority number, dateJP1997003508319.02.1997         Original published format: JP 3508397
[1998/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0860946
Date:26.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0860946
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H03K17/082
[1998/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/40]
Former [1998/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schaltkreis mit Überstromfühler-Funktion[1998/35]
English:Switch circuit having excess-current detection function[1998/35]
French:Circuit commutateur ayant une fonction de détection de courant excessif[1998/35]
Examination procedure22.05.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
05.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/43]
21.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0600751  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,6 * page 5, line 1 - page 18, line 37; figures 1-8 * [Y] 2-5,7-9;
 [YA]EP0323813  (MARELLI AUTRONICA [IT]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * [A] 1;
 [YA]GB2244183  (PLESSEY AEROSPACE LIMITED [GB]) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,6-9;
 [YA]US4967304  (DOUGHERTY JOHN J [US]) [Y] 7-9 * the whole document * [A] 1-6;
 [A]DE3338764  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]US4740883  (MCCOLLUM PATRICK E [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 12 - line 26 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 59 * * column 6, line 36 - column 9, line 50 * * figures 4,8,14-16 *;
 [A]WO8102496  (ELLISON GEORGE LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0350301  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5394287  (SAKATA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *