Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0848507

EP0848507 - Method and apparatus for low power communications between mobile computing devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  19.10.2007
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
P.O. Box 655474
Mail Station 3999
Dallas, Texas 75265 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/25]For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
P.O. Box 655474, Mail Station 3999
Dallas, Texas 75265 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Siep, Thomas M.
2406 Denmark Drive
Garland, TX 75040 / US
02 / Panasik, Carl M.
3322 Bendin Oaks Trail
Garland, TX 75044 / US
03 / Stafford, Ronald E.
529 Shore Drive
Wylie, TX 75098 / US
[1998/25]
Representative(s)Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Limited
European Patent Department
3rd Floor
401 Grafton Gate
Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive
Northampton NN4 7YL / GB
Former [1998/25]Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Limited, Kempton Point, 68 Staines Road West
Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7AX / GB
Application number, filing date97120775.826.11.1997
[1998/25]
Priority number, dateUS1996075356326.11.1996         Original published format: US 753563
[1998/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0848507
Date:17.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26, H04L12/56, G09B5/14
[1998/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/09]
Former [1998/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kleinleistungkommunikation zwischen mobile Rechnern[1998/25]
English:Method and apparatus for low power communications between mobile computing devices[1998/25]
French:Méthode et appareil de communication à faible puissance entre des calculateurs mobiles[1998/25]
Examination procedure17.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/08]
05.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
12.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/47]
10.07.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/47]
Appeal following examination14.02.2005Appeal received No.  T0730/05
26.04.2005Statement of grounds filed
10.07.2007Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
10.07.2007Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP07112109.9  / EP1843309
Request for further processing for:12.02.2004Request for further processing filed
12.02.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.02.2004Decision despatched
12.03.2003Request for further processing filed
12.03.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.03.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200105   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5481535  (HERSHEY JOHN E) [X] 1-5,8,9,11-14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 32-33 * * column 2, lines 37-53 * * column 4, lines 18-41 * * column 8, lines 47-57 * [Y] 6,15,16,18-20;
 [XY]US5481539  (HERSHEY JOHN E ET AL) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, lines 47-48 * * column 2, lines 3-38 * * column 4, lines 35-60 * * column 6, lines 4-7 * * column 7, lines 32-33 * [Y] 15,16,18-20;
 [X]DE4224422  (SEL ALCATEL AG) [X] 1 * column 3, line 65 - column 6, line 47 *;
 [A]DE4304906  (ALTVATER ULRICH) [A] 15 * claims 1,2 *
 [Y]  - BHARGHAVAN V, "A DYNAMIC ADDRESSING SCHEME FOR WIRELESS MEDIA ACCESS", COMMUNICATIONS - GATEWAY TO GLOBALIZATION. PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, SEATTLE, JUNE 18 - 22, 1995, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19950618), VOL. 2, pages 756 - 760, XP000533113 [Y] 6 * paragraph [02.2] *
 [XY]  - JUBIN J AND TORNOW J D, "The DARPA Packet Radio Network Protocols", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, USA, (198701), vol. 75, no. 1, pages 21 - 32, XP002061709 [X] 1-4,8,9,11-13 * page 21, column R, lines 9-24 * * page 22, column R, lines 13-40; figure 1 * * page 26, column L, line 8 - column R, line 23 * * page 27, column R, lines 8-28 * [Y] 10
 [XY]  - CHLAMTAC I AND WEINSTEIN O, "Distributed "Wave" Broadcasting in Mobile Multi-Hop Radio Networks", 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS, BERLIN, BRD, (1987), pages 82 - 89, XP002063458 [X] 1,3,4,6 * abstract * * page 84, column R, line 36 - page 85, column L, line 38 * [Y] 10