Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0848507 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0848507



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 272
30.04.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
12.10.2007 Closing of application Search / examination 2
13.09.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 14
18.07.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 13
05.07.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
05.07.2007 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.07.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.03.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.03.2007 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
08.03.2007 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
06.03.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.12.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.11.2006 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
28.11.2006 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
20.11.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Appeal 1
20.11.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.11.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
26.10.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.10.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 23
11.10.2006 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.05.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 19
07.07.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
16.06.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
09.06.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
09.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.05.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
26.04.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.04.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.04.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
18.02.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
14.02.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
13.01.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
16.12.2004 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
16.12.2004 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
16.12.2004 Means of redress Search / examination 1
08.12.2004 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
16.11.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
10.11.2004 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.11.2004 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
08.11.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.11.2004 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.08.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
09.08.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
09.08.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.08.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.02.2004 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.02.2004 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
12.02.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.02.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.12.2003 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
09.12.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.08.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
01.08.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.03.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
20.03.2003 Description Search / examination 8
20.03.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
12.03.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 18
21.01.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
11.10.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.06.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
05.06.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.04.2002 General enquiry Search / examination 1
08.01.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
18.06.2001 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.06.2001 General enquiry Search / examination 1
09.11.1998 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.10.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
20.05.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.05.1998 European search report Search / examination 3
18.05.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
23.04.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.04.1998 European search report Search / examination 3
13.04.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.04.1998 European search report Search / examination 3
26.11.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.11.1997 Claims Search / examination 4
26.11.1997 Description Search / examination 11
26.11.1997 Drawings Search / examination 3
26.11.1997 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
26.11.1997 Priority document Search / examination 23
26.11.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5