Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0845669

EP0845669 - A wide range air/fuel ratio sensor having one electrochemical cell and method of detecting two types of air/fuel ratios by using the same sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Spark Plug Co. Ltd.
No. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi 467 / JP
[2006/23]
Former [1998/23]For all designated states
NGK Spark Plug Co. Ltd.
No. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kojima, Takao
1002 Sanpaku Higashibetsuin, 5-19, Ooi-cho
Naka-ku, Nagoya, Aichi / JP
02 / Takahashi, Koichi
6-78, Kouyoudai
Kani, Gifu / JP
03 / Ooi, Mitsunori
9-114-1, Kamijou-cho
Kasugai, Aichi / JP
04 / Saito, Takuya
15-1, Goumaenishi, Higashino
Kounan, Aichi / JP
[1998/23]
Representative(s)Vetter, Hans
Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/23]Vetter, Hans, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Otto Reimold Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hans Vetter, Dipl.-Ing. Martin Abel, H lderlinweg 58
73728 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date97121024.029.11.1997
[1998/23]
Priority number, dateJP1996031980929.11.1996         Original published format: JP 31980996
[1998/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0845669
Date:03.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0845669
Date:03.05.2000
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0845669
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/407
[1998/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/02]
Former [1998/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Luft-/Kraftstoffverhältnissensor über einen breiten Bereich mit einer elektrochemischen Zelle und Verfahren zur Detektion von zwei Arten von Luft/Kraftstoffverhältnissen unter Verwendung dieses Sensors[1998/23]
English:A wide range air/fuel ratio sensor having one electrochemical cell and method of detecting two types of air/fuel ratios by using the same sensor[1998/23]
French:Détecteur de rapport air/carburant dans un domaine étendu, ayant une cellule électrochimique et méthode de détection de deux types de rapport air/carburant en utilisant le même détecteur[1998/23]
Examination procedure06.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
04.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
08.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2005Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2006Fee for grant paid
14.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
11.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB29.11.2006
[2008/07]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4304652  (CHIBA MASAO, et al) [X] 1,6,12,13,17-19 * column 3, line 25 - line 41 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 6 * * column 6, line 45 - line 63 * * column 8, line 55 - line 62; figures 1,7,8 * * the whole document * [Y] 2,4,5,14,15;
 [XY]US4101403  (KITA TORU, et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,10 * column 4, line 17 - line 46 * * column 6, line 35 - column 8, line 4 * [Y] 5,16-19;
 [XY]US4547281  (WANG DA Y [US], et al) [X] 5 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 5 * * abstract * [Y] 1,2,6,7;
 [Y]US4502939  (HOLFELDER GERHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 1,4,6-8,13-18 * column 2, line 57 - line 64 * * column 1, line 36 - line 63 * * column 6, line 26 - line 42; figure 4 *;
 [Y]US4224113  (KIMURA SHINJI, et al) [Y] 1,2,5-8,13,16-19 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 2; figures 6,7,13 * * column 5, line 50 - line 63 * * the whole document *
ExaminationUS4419213
 US4416763
 US4882033