Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0848253

EP0848253 - Ion mobility spectrometer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2002
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.11.2002  [2002/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EADS Deutschland GmbH
81663 München / DE
[2001/42]
Former [1999/14]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1998/25]For all designated states
DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Breit, Ulrich
Zänglweg 22
81735 München / DE
02 / Göbel, Johann
Eilandstrasse 13
81547 München / DE
[1998/25]
Application number, filing date97121112.302.12.1997
[1998/25]
Priority number, dateDE199615041905.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19650419
[1998/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0848253
Date:17.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0848253
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0848253
Date:14.11.2001
Language:DE
[2001/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/64
[1998/25]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/41]
Former [1998/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ionen-Mobilitäts-Spektrometer[1998/25]
English:Ion mobility spectrometer[1998/25]
French:Spectromètre à mobilité d'ions[1998/25]
Examination procedure21.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/38]
02.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2001Fee for grant paid
30.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4362941  (CASTLEMAN B WAYNE, et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 7 * * column 5, line 17 - line 27 * * column 5, line 43 - line 46; figures 1,4 *;
 [Y]US4390784  (BROWNING DAVID R, et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 26 - line 29 * * column 4, line 19 - line 24 * * column 6, line 56 - line 57; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5179289  (SRIDHARAN GOVIND [IN]) [Y] 1-4 * Zusammenfassung *; column 2, line 39 - line 40; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US3748492  (BAKER R) [Y] 1-4 * column 3, line 8 - line 9 * * column 3, line 55 - line 59; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4654769  (MIDDLEBROOK ROBERT D [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 17 - line 32; figure 5 *