Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0864314

EP0864314 - Use of natural oils in hair treatment compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 02.01.2003  [2003/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wella Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Allee 65
64274 Darmstadt / DE
[1998/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Titze, Hans-Jürgen
Pestalozzistrasse 35
64401 Grosse-Bieberau / DE
02 / Karlen, Thomas Dr.
Greyerzstrasse 29
3013 Bern / DE
03 / Birkel, Susanne Dr.
Vösendorfring 36
64380 Rossdorf / DE
04 / Schmenger, Jürgen
Heinrich-Rühl-Strasse 38 a
64331 Weiterstadt / DE
[1998/38]
Application number, filing date97121198.203.12.1997
[1998/38]
Priority number, dateDE199711087415.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19710874
[1998/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0864314
Date:16.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0864314
Date:15.11.2000
[2000/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/06
[1998/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/31]
Former [1998/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verwendung natürlicher Öle in Haarbehandlungsmitteln[1998/38]
English:Use of natural oils in hair treatment compositions[1998/38]
French:Utilisation des huiles naturelles dans des compositions pour le soin des cheveux[1998/38]
Examination procedure04.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/10]
05.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
23.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/01]
02.08.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5344643  (THIEL DAWN M [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 8, line 24 - line 43 * * column W * [A] 4;
 [A]WO9308787  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 27, line 22 - page 30, line 31 *