Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0855311

EP0855311 - Sound system for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2011
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 31.10.2012  [2012/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH
Becker-Göring-Strasse 16
76307 Karlsbad / DE
[2010/34]
Former [2006/35]For all designated states
Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH
Becker-Boering-Str. 16
76307 Karlsbad / DE
Former [1998/31]For all designated states
BECKER GmbH
Im Stöckmädle 1
D-76307 Karlsbad / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Becker, Michael
Kronenwerkstrasse 20
76661 Philippsburg / DE
[1998/31]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Waldstrasse 33
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date97121297.204.12.1997
[1998/31]
Priority number, dateDE199615130810.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19651308
[1998/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0855311
Date:29.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0855311
Date:17.06.2009
[2009/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0855311
Date:25.08.2010
Language:DE
[2010/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:B60R16/00, H04B1/20, H04L12/403, // H04L12/40, H04L29/08
[2009/25]
Former International [1998/31]B60R16/00, H04B1/20, H04L12/403
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2010/10]
Former [2010/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  LI 
Former [1998/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Soundsystem für ein Kraftfahrzeug[1998/31]
English:Sound system for a motor vehicle[1998/31]
French:Système sonore pour véhicule à moteur[1998/31]
Examination procedure11.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/03]
13.04.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2010Fee for grant paid
08.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
IE25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
GR26.11.2010
AT04.12.2010
LU04.12.2010
ES06.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
[2012/44]
Former [2012/11]DK25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
IE25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
GR26.11.2010
AT04.12.2010
ES06.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/48]DK25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
IE25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/45]DK25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
IE25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/35]DK25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
IE25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/27]DK25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
IE25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
GR26.11.2010
PT27.12.2010
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0725522  (BECKER GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,17,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5237322  (HEBERLE KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1,17,18 * column 2, lines 9-31 *;
 [A]US5040168  (MAUE H WINSTON [US] ET AL) [A] 1,17,18 * column 4, lines 43-57 *