Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0847035 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0847035



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 216
18.01.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
17.10.2005 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
06.10.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 16
04.05.2005 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
29.06.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.06.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
21.06.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
16.02.2004 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.02.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
09.02.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
02.02.2004 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
02.02.2004 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
22.01.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.01.2004 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
14.01.2004 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
09.01.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
15.12.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.12.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.12.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.12.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
08.12.2003 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
08.12.2003 Text intended for grant Opposition 5
23.10.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
23.10.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
23.10.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
23.10.2003 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
23.10.2003 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.08.2003 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.07.2003 Claims Opposition 1
19.07.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 6
18.07.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 7
14.04.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.04.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.04.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.04.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.04.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
08.04.2003 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
08.04.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 2
17.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.10.2002 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
24.05.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.05.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.05.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.04.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
17.04.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
17.04.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
17.04.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.06.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.03.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.03.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
14.03.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.12.2000 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
13.12.2000 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.08.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
25.08.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
05.07.2000 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
25.01.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.01.1999 European search report Search / examination 2
01.04.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.04.1998 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
01.04.1998 Priority document Search / examination 14
04.02.1998 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.12.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
05.12.1997 Description Search / examination 7
05.12.1997 Drawings Search / examination 1
05.12.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7