EP0848089 - Degradable monofilament and preparation process thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinoda, Hosei 2-2-3, 1541, Yabe-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 244 / JP | 02 /
Ajioka, Masanobu 1172-3-202, Kamikurata-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 244 / JP | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Strehl & Partner mbB Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121565.2 | 08.12.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | JP19960329986 | 10.12.1996 Original published format: JP 32998696 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0848089 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0848089 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848089 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/84, A61L17/00 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
D01F6/84 (EP,US);
A61L17/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/26] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abbaubares Monofilament und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1998/25] | English: | Degradable monofilament and preparation process thereof | [1998/25] | French: | Monofilament dégradable et son procédé de fabrication | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 19.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5275618 (KOYFMAN ILYA [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 18 - column 4, line 50; figure 2; claim - *; | [A]US4027676 (MATTEI FRANK V) [A] 1 * column 1, line 14 - column 5, line 30; claim - *; | [A]US5232648 (KENNEDY JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 9 - column 6, line 12; claim - * |